PDF Download - Deutsche Bahn AG
PDF Download - Deutsche Bahn AG
PDF Download - Deutsche Bahn AG
Create successful ePaper yourself
Turn your PDF publications into a flip-book with our unique Google optimized e-Paper software.
84 |<br />
deutSChe BahN aG<br />
CHANGES IN DB <strong>AG</strong>’S SUPERVISORY BOARD AND THE MAN<strong>AG</strong>EMENT BOARD<br />
Professor Dr. Dr. Utz-Hellmuth Felcht was elected Chairman of the Supervisory Board on March 24, 2010.<br />
He succeeds Dr. Werner Müller whose mandate ended on this date due to the expiration of his term of office.<br />
The term of office of the following members of the DB <strong>AG</strong> Supervisory Board ended on March 24, 2010:<br />
shareholder representatives Mr. Georg Brunnhuber and Mr. Niels-Lund Chrestensen; employee representatives<br />
Mr. Jörg Hartkorn and Ms. Heike Moll. New members elected to the Supervisory Board effective<br />
March 24, 2010 were: Mr. Patrick Döring and Professor Dr. Knut Löschke were elected as shareholder<br />
representatives. On March 11, 2010 Messrs. Mario Reiß and Wolfgang Joosten were newly elected to the<br />
Supervisory Board as employee representatives.<br />
Dr. Walther Otremba, who resigned his mandate as member of the Supervisory Board effective<br />
March 8, 2010, was succeeded by State Secretary Dr. Hans Bernhard Beus, who was seconded to the<br />
Supervisory Board effective March 9, 2010.<br />
Effective March 31, 2010 Mr. Diethelm Sack resigned his mandate as member of the DB <strong>AG</strong> Management<br />
Board, where he was the Chief Financial Officer. He was succeeded effective April 1, 2010 by Dr. Richard<br />
Lutz. Effective March 31, 2010 Mr. Stefan Garber also resigned his mandate as member of the DB <strong>AG</strong> Management<br />
Board, where he was the head of the Infrastructure division. He was succeeded on April 1, 2010 by<br />
Dr. Volker Kefer who will serve for the remainder of his existing term. Dr. Kefer had already served as the<br />
provisional head of the Infrastructure division since December 9, 2009. Dr. Kefer is also responsible for the<br />
Rail Technology and Services Division.<br />
At this point, the Supervisory Board would also like to thank the former members of the Management<br />
Board and Supervisory Board for their committed and constructive support on behalf of the company.<br />
The Supervisory Board thanks the Management Board, all employees as well as the DB <strong>AG</strong> employees’<br />
representatives and its affiliated companies for their dedicated efforts during the year under review.<br />
Berlin, March 2011<br />
For the Supervisory Board<br />
Sincerely,<br />
Professor Dr. Dr. Utz-Hellmuth Felcht<br />
Chairman of the Supervisory Board<br />
of <strong>Deutsche</strong> <strong>Bahn</strong> <strong>AG</strong>