Hospital Staff June 2013 - Pt. Khushilal Sharma Government
Hospital Staff June 2013 - Pt. Khushilal Sharma Government
Hospital Staff June 2013 - Pt. Khushilal Sharma Government
Create successful ePaper yourself
Turn your PDF publications into a flip-book with our unique Google optimized e-Paper software.
33 Ms. Shalini Nirpure Late Kamal Prasad<br />
Pandole<br />
03.08.1982 G.N.M. 16.02.2009 <strong>Staff</strong> Nurse<br />
34 Ms. Shija Thomas Mr. L.M.Thomas 07.02.1970 G.N.M. 16.02.2009 <strong>Staff</strong> Nurse<br />
35 Ms. Vibha Yadav Mr. A.K. Yadav 17.05.1986 G.N.M. 16.02.2009 <strong>Staff</strong> Nurse<br />
36 Ms. Vinita Dubey Mr. Kedarnath Dubey 19.02.1985 G.N.M. 17.02.2009 <strong>Staff</strong> Nurse<br />
37 Ms. Varsha Verma Mr. Vibhu Sharan Rai 24.09.1983 G.N.M. 18.02.2009 <strong>Staff</strong> Nurse<br />
38 Ms. Mahima Verma Mr. Rajkishor Verma 07.03.1985 G.N.M. 24.02.2009 <strong>Staff</strong> Nurse<br />
39 Ms. Sandhya Tiwari Mr. L.N. Tiwari 03.01.1986 B.Sc.<br />
Nursing<br />
40 Ms. Sujata Sunil Mr. Sunil Gopalan 14.05.1975 Nursing<br />
Training<br />
41 Mr. Mahendra Singh<br />
Rathore<br />
Mr. Gokual Singh<br />
Rathore<br />
42 Mr. Arun Kumar Mishra Mr. Ramkaran Mishra 01.01.1977 D. Pharm<br />
(Ayu)<br />
43 Mr. Satish Singh Mr. B.B.Singh 15.07.1983 D. Pharm<br />
(Ayu)<br />
44 Mr. Ganga Prasad Yadav Mr. RamdinYadav 28.06.1975 D. Pharm<br />
(Ayu)<br />
45 Mr. Krishna Das Mishra Mr. Ramkaran Mishra 20.08.1986 D. Pharm<br />
(Ayu)<br />
46 Ms. Geeta Tiwari Mr. L.L.Tiwari 11.03.1975 D. Pharm<br />
(Ayu)<br />
47 Mr. Jaivind Singh Solanki Mr. Rameshwar Solanki 01.07.1979 D. Pharm<br />
(Ayu)<br />
48 Mr. Madan Lal Pandram Mr. Shyamlal Pandram 21.06.1982 Higher<br />
Secondary<br />
D.M.L.T.<br />
49 Mr. Rakesh Singh Mr. Lal Singh 06.07.1975 Radiographe<br />
Narvaria<br />
diploma<br />
50 Mr. Ravi Shankar Gupta Mr. M.L. Gupta 28.03.1982 Higher<br />
Secondary<br />
24.02.2009 <strong>Staff</strong> Nurse<br />
18.12.2009 <strong>Staff</strong> Nurse<br />
15.12.1977 G.N.M. 18.12.2009 <strong>Staff</strong> Nurse<br />
03.09.2008 Pharmacist<br />
04.09.2008 Pharmacist<br />
04.09.2008 Pharmacist<br />
10.02.2009 Pharmacist<br />
11.09.2008 Pharmacist<br />
16.02.2009 Pharmacist<br />
06.05.2008 Lab. Technician<br />
02.02.2009 Radiographer<br />
06.09.2008 Dark room<br />
Attendant<br />
51 Mr. Shambha Ji Rao Mr. Shyam Rao 05.10.1977 B.A. 03.09.2008 Panchkarma<br />
Assistant<br />
52 Ms. Chandra Malviya Mr. Ajay Malviya 04.04.1978 Higher<br />
Secondary<br />
53 Mr. Kamalesh Malviya Mr. Suresh Malviya 20.06.1985 Higher<br />
Secondary<br />
03.09.2008 Dresser<br />
03.09.2008 Dresser<br />
54 Mr. Santosh Shukla Mr. Samaya Lal Shukla 01.07.1974 B.A. 19.12.2008 Dresser<br />
55 Mr. Manoj Malviya Mr. L.N. Malviya 10.10.1974 8 th 09.05.2008 Ward boy<br />
56 Mr. Veeru Malviya Mr. Deepak Malviya 06.01.1974 8 th 09.05.2008 Ward boy<br />
57 Mr. Narayan Singh<br />
Malviya<br />
Mr. H.K. Malviya 01.04.1974 8 th 09.05.2008 Ward boy<br />
58 Mr. Devanand Dawane Mr. U.R.Dawane 26.06.1975 8 th 12.05.2008 Ward boy<br />
59 Mr. Indal Kumar Mr. Chokhe Lal 01.01.1971 8 th 09.01.2009 Ward boy<br />
60 Mr. Pradeep Kumar<br />
Dubey<br />
Mr. Harinaryan Dubey 15.07.1968 8 th 09.01.2009 Ward boy<br />
61 Ms. Parvati Bai Pandwari Mr. Rajesh Pandwari 20.12.1973 8 th 09.01.2009 Ward boy<br />
62 Ms. Vimla Devi Mr. Sunil Kumar 17.12.1975 8 th 09.01.2009 Ward boy<br />
<strong>Pt</strong>. KLS <strong>Government</strong> Ayurveda College & Institute, Bhopal Page 2