HM ZP LIST-SPSR NELLORE-09-06-2010
HM ZP LIST-SPSR NELLORE-09-06-2010
HM ZP LIST-SPSR NELLORE-09-06-2010
Create successful ePaper yourself
Turn your PDF publications into a flip-book with our unique Google optimized e-Paper software.
Sl. No.<br />
NAME<br />
Present Place of working<br />
Designation<br />
DATE OF FIRST APPOINTMENT IN THE LOWER<br />
CADRE (I.E., SGT OR EQUIVALENT CADRE)<br />
TENTATIVE SENIORITY <strong>LIST</strong> - SCHOOL ASSISTANT FOR PROMOTIONS TO GAZETTED HEADMASTER - SRI POTTI SRIRAMULU <strong>NELLORE</strong> DISTRICT (ZILLA PARISHAD) - 08-<strong>06</strong>-<strong>2010</strong> - GENERAL <strong>LIST</strong><br />
FOR<br />
FOR<br />
DIRECT<br />
PROMOT<br />
RECRUITE<br />
EES<br />
ES<br />
NAME OF THE MANAGEMENT IN<br />
WHICH JOINED IN LOWER CADRE (I.E.<br />
SGT OR EQUIVALENT CADRE) AS<br />
NAME OF THE MANAGEMENT IN<br />
WHICH JOINED IN THE PRESENT<br />
CADRE (S.A. EQUIVALENT CADRE) AS<br />
PER SERVICE REGISTER<br />
COMMUNITY<br />
DATE OF BIRTH<br />
CATEGORY OF THE POST WORKING AND SUBJECT<br />
DATE OF APPOINTMENT IN THE PRESENT<br />
CATEGORY<br />
DATE OF REGULARISATION IN THE PRESENT CADRE<br />
NAME OF THE SSC OR EQUIVALENT EXAMINATIONS<br />
AND MONTH AND YEAR OF PASSING<br />
NAME OF THE SSLC OR EQUIVALENT EXAMINATIONS<br />
AND MONTH AND YEAR OF PASSING<br />
NAME OF THE INTERMEDIATE OR EQUIVALENT<br />
EXAMINATIONS AND MONTH AND YEAR OF PASSING<br />
1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 25 26 27<br />
41 Devathoti Robert Paul<br />
42 M.SUDHAKAR<br />
43 Sk.Anwar Hussain<br />
44<br />
PATLHA. RAJYA<br />
LAKS<strong>HM</strong>I<br />
<strong>ZP</strong>HS,CHEMUD<br />
UGUNTA<br />
<strong>ZP</strong>HS,<br />
MARRIPADU<br />
MPUPS,<br />
APPAIKANDRI<br />
GA<br />
<strong>ZP</strong>GHS,<br />
KOVUR<br />
SA-BS ---- ---- MP/<strong>ZP</strong> BC 29/05/1967 SA-BS 30/11/1996 30/11/1996<br />
S.S.C.,<br />
MARCH,<br />
1982<br />
----<br />
INTER,<br />
APRIL,<br />
1984<br />
NAME OF THE DEGREE OR EQUIVALENT<br />
EXAMINATIONS AND MONTH AND YEAR OF PASSING<br />
B.Sc., MAY<br />
1987<br />
NAME OF THE B.ED OR EQUIVALENT EXAMINATIONS<br />
AND MONTH AND YEAR OF PASSING<br />
B.Ed., MAY<br />
1989<br />
NAME OF THE M.Ed OR EQUIVALENT EXAMINATIONS<br />
AND MONTH AND YEAR OF PASSING<br />
Date from which seniority is counted<br />
---- 30/11/1996<br />
SA-MAT ---- ---- MP/<strong>ZP</strong> BCA 01/07/1973 SA-MAT 28/11/1996 28/11/1996 SSC-1989 ---- 01/04/1991 B.Sc,April-1994 B.Ed,Oct-1995 ---- 28/11/1996<br />
Particulars of Departmenal Tests passed GO/EO<br />
Nov - o4, Jan -<br />
o6<br />
jul-20<strong>06</strong>, mar-<br />
2008<br />
SPL LANGUAGE TEST FOR THE OFFICERS OF<br />
EDUCATION DEPARTMENT IN TELUGU HIGHER<br />
STANDARD<br />
SPL LANGUAGE TEST FOR THE OFFICERS OF EDN<br />
DEPT IN HINDI/URDU LOWER STANDARD<br />
WHETHER ANY CHARGES ARE PENDING<br />
REMARKS<br />
MANDAL<br />
---- ---- NO ---- VENKATACHALAM<br />
---- ---- NO ---- MARRIPADU<br />
SA-BS ---- ---- MP/<strong>ZP</strong> BC <strong>06</strong>/01/1971 SA-BS 30/11/1996 30/11/1996 SSC,1986 ---- INTER,1988 B.Sc,1991 BED 21/01/20<strong>06</strong> 30/11/1996 2004, 2005 ---- ---- NO ---- <strong>NELLORE</strong><br />
SA-MAT ---- ---- MP/<strong>ZP</strong> OC 22/08/1971 SA-MAT 01/04/1997 01/04/1997 SSC 1986 ----<br />
INTER<br />
1988<br />
B.Sc<br />
1991<br />
B.E.d.<br />
1993<br />
---- 01/04/1997<br />
Nov, 2005, May,<br />
2005<br />
---- ---- NO ---- KOVUR<br />
DSC ROSTER POINT / YEAR OF PROMOTION<br />
DSC-<br />
1996SC0016<br />
DSC-<br />
1996MM0018<br />
DSC-<br />
1996SC0017<br />
DSC-<br />
1996MM0019<br />
DSC ROSTER POINT / YEAR OF PROMOTION<br />
DSC<br />
DSC<br />
DSC<br />
DSC<br />
45 S.MALYADRI<br />
<strong>ZP</strong>HS,<br />
DAGADARTHI<br />
SA-SS ---- ---- MP/<strong>ZP</strong> OC 05/12/1960 SA-SS 04/12/1996 04/12/1996 SSC-1976 ---- INTER-1979 BA-1990 BED-1991 ---- 04/12/1996<br />
AUG-2001,<br />
exempted<br />
---- ---- NO<br />
CROSSED 45<br />
YEARS<br />
DAGDARTHI<br />
DSC-<br />
1996SS0022<br />
DSC<br />
46 V.Supriya<br />
MPUPS,<br />
MUTTEMBAKA SA-MAT ---- ---- MP/<strong>ZP</strong> OC 11/05/1968 SA-MAT 01/01/1997 01/01/1997 SSC-1984 ---- INTER-1986 BA-1990 BED-1995 ---- 01/01/1997 JUN.07, JUN.07 ---- ---- NO ---- VAKADU DSC-<br />
1996MM0020<br />
DSC<br />
47 P.MUTHUSWAMY<br />
<strong>ZP</strong>HS,L.A.SAG<br />
ARAM<br />
48 B.V.SUBRAMANYAM <strong>ZP</strong>HS,MUTHUK<br />
UR<br />
49 M.A.RAHEEM<br />
<strong>ZP</strong>HS,SARVAY<br />
APALEM<br />
SA-SS ---- ---- MP/<strong>ZP</strong> BCA 15/03/1966 SA-SS 30/11/1996 30/11/1996 SSC-1981 ---- INTER-1984 BA-1987 BED-1990 ---- 30/11/1996 2001, 2004 ---- ---- NO ---- NAIDUPET<br />
SA-MAT ---- ---- MP/<strong>ZP</strong> OC 03/12/1964 SA-MAT 16/07/1997 16/07/1997 SSC-1980 ---- INTER-1982 BSC-1989 BED-1990 2000 16/07/1997 20<strong>06</strong>, 2007 ---- ---- NO ---- Muthukur DSC-1996-NT DSC<br />
SA-BS ---- ---- MP/<strong>ZP</strong> OC 01/<strong>06</strong>/1969 SA-BS 29/11/1996 29/11/1996<br />
50 U.Venkateswarlu <strong>ZP</strong>BHS, Kota SA-SS ---- ---- MP/<strong>ZP</strong> OC 01/07/1963 SA-SS 30/11/1996 30/11/1996<br />
51<br />
P.HARISH SALUJA<br />
RANI<br />
<strong>ZP</strong>HS,SOUTH<br />
MOPUR<br />
SSC<br />
3/1984<br />
SSC-Mar-<br />
1979<br />
----<br />
INTER<br />
10/1986<br />
B.Sc 4/1990 B.Ed 1991 ---- 29/11/1996<br />
---- Inter-Mar-1981 B.A-Apr-1984 B.Ed-Aug-1990 ---- 30/11/1996<br />
SA-BS ---- ---- MP/<strong>ZP</strong> BCC 21/02/1966 SA-BS 29/11/1996 29/11/1996 SSC-1981 ---- INTER-1984 BSC-1987 BED-1991 ---- 29/11/1996<br />
'oct-2000, aug-<br />
2001<br />
jun, 2005, jan-<br />
20<strong>06</strong><br />
jan-20<strong>06</strong>, jun-<br />
2005<br />
---- ---- NO ---- KAVALI<br />
---- ---- NO<br />
CROSSED 45<br />
YEARS<br />
Kota<br />
---- ---- NO ---- <strong>NELLORE</strong><br />
DSC-<br />
1996SS0023<br />
DSC-<br />
1996SC0020<br />
DSC-<br />
1996SS0024<br />
DSC-<br />
1996SC0021<br />
DSC<br />
DSC<br />
DSC<br />
DSC<br />
52 M.SUJATHA<br />
MPUPS,<br />
R.C.PURAM,<br />
BUCHI<br />
MANDAL<br />
SA-SS ---- ---- MP/<strong>ZP</strong> OC 01/04/1971 SA-SS 28/11/1996 28/11/1996 SSC-1988 ---- INTER-APR, 1991BA-1994 BED-1995 ---- 28/11/1996<br />
GO-OCT-2008,<br />
EO-OCT-2008<br />
---- ---- NO ---- BUCHIREDDYPALEM<br />
DSC-<br />
1996SS001<strong>06</strong><br />
DSC<br />
53 B.LATHA <strong>ZP</strong>HS,REBALA SA-BS ---- ---- MP/<strong>ZP</strong> BC 01/07/1968 SA-BS 17/04/1998 17/04/1998 SSC-1983 ---- INTER-1985 BSC-1989 BED-1993 1997 17/04/1998<br />
54 SETTY BHAVANI<br />
55 B.PADMAJA<br />
56 H.D.PHANIVENI<br />
<strong>ZP</strong>HS,POTTEP<br />
ALEM<br />
<strong>ZP</strong>HS,MUTHUK<br />
UR<br />
<strong>ZP</strong>HS,KOTAPO<br />
LUR<br />
SA-SS ---- ---- MP/<strong>ZP</strong> BCB 16/08/1961 SA-SS <strong>06</strong>/12/1996 <strong>06</strong>/12/1996 SSC-76 ---- APOUS-1985 BA-88 BED-1991 ---- <strong>06</strong>/12/1996<br />
MAY,2003,<br />
NOV,2004<br />
exempted,<br />
exempted<br />
---- ---- NO ---- BUCHI<br />
---- ---- NO<br />
SA-SS ---- ---- MP/<strong>ZP</strong> BCA 05/<strong>06</strong>/1973 SA-SS <strong>09</strong>/12/1996 <strong>09</strong>/12/1996 SSC-1988 ---- INTER-1990 BA-1993 BED-1995 ---- <strong>09</strong>/12/1996 2008, 2007 ---- ---- NO ---- Muthukur<br />
SA-SS ---- ---- MP/<strong>ZP</strong> OC 10/<strong>09</strong>/1970 SA-SS 30/11/1996 30/11/1996 SSC-1986 ---- INTER-1988 BCOM-1991 BED-1998 ---- 30/11/1996 2003, 20<strong>06</strong> ---- ---- NO ---- SULLURPET<br />
CROSSED 45<br />
YEARS<br />
<strong>NELLORE</strong><br />
DSC-<br />
1996SC0022<br />
DSC-<br />
1996SS0028<br />
DSC-<br />
1996SS0029<br />
DSC-<br />
1996SS0030<br />
DSC<br />
DSC<br />
DSC<br />
DSC<br />
Page 4 of 7