I. NOTICE OF ESTABLISHMENT OF COMMERCIAL ENTERPRISE
I. NOTICE OF ESTABLISHMENT OF COMMERCIAL ENTERPRISE
I. NOTICE OF ESTABLISHMENT OF COMMERCIAL ENTERPRISE
Create successful ePaper yourself
Turn your PDF publications into a flip-book with our unique Google optimized e-Paper software.
Mr.Apdol Manan Pinmohamat transfer to Mr.Othsman Ben Hassan<br />
2. Resolution on the shareholder increasing from 100 shares to 1,000 shares.<br />
- Shareholder divided into 1,000 shares at 20,000 Riels per share.<br />
- Mrs.Asiyak Pintialy has 30 shares from No.0001 to No.0300<br />
- Mr.Othsman Hassan has 700 shares from No.20,301 to No.1,000<br />
Place of Filling Registered Address No.257, St.51, Sangkat Boeung Keng Kang1, Khan Chamcarmorn, Phnom Penh.<br />
At the Commercial Registration Office of the Legal Affairs Division, Ministry of Commerce.<br />
Contact: Registered Address No.257, St.51, Sangkat Boeung Keng Kang1, Khan Chamcarmorn, Phnom Penh.<br />
Name of Chairman Mrs.Asiyak Pintialy, Director.<br />
98. THY HOLDING CO., LTD.<br />
Registration Number Co.10437KH/2007, Dated: 06.08.2007<br />
Place of Registration Department of Business Registration, Ministry of Commerce.<br />
Board Resolution Dated: 07.02.2011<br />
1. Resolution on the 01 new shareholder adding, Mr.Um Dara, share transfer of 300 shares of<br />
Mr.Nang Sothy transfer to Mr.Um Dara<br />
2. Resolution on the change Company's structure from Single Member Private Limited Company to<br />
Private Limited Company.<br />
3. Resolution on the new director nomination:<br />
- Mr.Nang Sothy as a board director.<br />
- Mr.Um Dara as a director.<br />
Place of Filling Registered Address J18, Phum Chong Thnol Khang Keut, Sangkat Teuk Thlar, Khan Sen Sok, Phnom<br />
At the Commercial Registration Office of the Legal Affairs Division, Ministry of Commerce.<br />
Contact: Registered Address<br />
Name of Chairman Mr.Nang Sothy, Director.<br />
99. (CAMBODIA) TRAVEL AND TOURS CO., LTD.<br />
Registration Number Co.2115/96P, Dated: 09.05.1996<br />
Place of Registration Department of Business Registration, Ministry of Commerce.<br />
Board Resolution Dated: 28.03.2011<br />
1. Resolution on the 02 shareholders resignation, Mr.Apdol Mananpin Mohamed called Sman<br />
Manan, Mr.Othsman Benhassan (previous directors)<br />
- Resolution on 02 new shareholders adding, Miss.Saliha Othsman, Mr.Rofy Othsman<br />
- Resolution on the share transfer.<br />
2. Resolution on the shareholder increasing from 100 shares to 1,000 shares.<br />
- Resolution on the new director nomination:<br />
+ Miss.Saliha Othsman as a board director.<br />
+ Mr.Rofy Othsman as a director.<br />
+ Mr.Sos Smael as a director.<br />
Place of Filling Registered Address No.61Eo, St.126, Sangkat Phsar Thmey1, Khan Daun Penh, Phnom Penh.<br />
At the Commercial Registration Office of the Legal Affairs Division, Ministry of Commerce.<br />
Contact: Registered Address No.61Eo, St.126, Sangkat Phsar Thmey1, Khan Daun Penh, Phnom Penh.<br />
Name of Chairman Miss.Saliha Othsman, Director.<br />
100. PHNOM PENH PAWN SHOP CO., LTD.<br />
Registration Number Co.0361KH/2010, Dated: 17.02.2010<br />
Place of Registration Department of Business Registration, Ministry of Commerce.<br />
Board Resolution Dated: 21.03.2011<br />
- Resolution on the 01 shareholder resignation, Mr.Chong Yee Seng (previous director)<br />
- Resolution on the 01 new shareholder adding, Mrs.Tang Ngech Vuoy<br />
- Resolution on the share transfer.<br />
- Resolution on the new director nomination, Mrs.Tang Ngech Vuoy as a director.<br />
Place of Filling Registered Address No.746E1, St.128, Sangkat Phsar Depo2, Khan Toul Kork, Phnom Penh.<br />
At the Commercial Registration Office of the Legal Affairs Division, Ministry of Commerce.<br />
Contact: Registered Address No.746E1, St.128, Sangkat Phsar Depo2, Khan Toul Kork, Phnom Penh.<br />
Name of Chairman Mr.Tang Peng Yu, Director.<br />
101. J C MARBLE CO., LTD.<br />
Registration Number Inv.1449/09E, Dated: 19.03.2009<br />
Place of Registration Department of Business Registration, Ministry of Commerce.<br />
Board Resolution Dated: 30.06.2010<br />
- Resolution on the 01 shareholder resignation.<br />
- Resolution on the 01 new shareholder additions.<br />
- Resolution on the share transfer.<br />
- Resolution on the new director nomination<br />
- Resolution on the capital increasing from USD$ 1,000,000 to USD$ 4,168,000 divided into<br />
Page 17 of 24