20th
HISTORY OF THE 20th FIGHTER WING - Shaw Air Force Base
HISTORY OF THE 20th FIGHTER WING - Shaw Air Force Base
Create successful ePaper yourself
Turn your PDF publications into a flip-book with our unique Google optimized e-Paper software.
Wethersfield, England Apr. 27, 1956 Jun. 1, 1970<br />
Upper Heyford, England Jun. 1, 1970 Dec. 30, 1993<br />
Shaw AFB, South Carolina Jan. 1, 1994 Present<br />
Assigned Aircraft<br />
BOEING P-12 November 1993 October 1932<br />
BOEING P-26 PEASHOOTER October 1932 September 1935<br />
CURTIS P-36 MOHAWK September 1935 September 1940<br />
CURTIS P-40 WARHAWK September 1940 February 1942<br />
BELL P-39 AIRACOBRA February 1942 May 1942<br />
REPUBLIC P-43 LANCER February 1942 September 1942<br />
LOCKHEED P-38 LIGHTNING May 1942 July 1944<br />
NORTH AMERICAN P-51 MUSTANG July 1944 February 1948<br />
REPUBLIC F-84B/D/E/F/G THUNDERJET, THUNDERSTREAK February 1948 December 1957<br />
NORTH AMERICAN F-100D/F SUPER SABRE June 1957 January 1971<br />
GENERAL DYNAMICS F-111E AARDVARK September 1970 Oct. 15, 1993<br />
REPUBLIC A/OA-10 THUNDERBOLT II Jan. 1, 1994 Jul. 3, 1996<br />
LOCKHEED MARTIN F-16C/D FIGHTING FALCON Jul. 7, 1997 Present<br />
Commanders<br />
Capt. Gev E. Lovell Aug. 9, 1917 c. Sep. 8, 1917<br />
1st Lt. Arthur W. Betts c. Sep. 8, 1917 Sep. 24, 1917<br />
Capt. Gustave G. Baetcke Sep. 24, 1917 Mar. 16, 1919<br />
1st Lt. Clarence E. Crumine Nov. 15, 1930 Aug. 24, 1934<br />
1st Lt. Earl W. Barnes Aug. 24, 1934 Mar. 29, 1935<br />
Capt. Armin F. Herold Mar. 29, 1935 Oct. 7, 1936<br />
Capt. Morris R. Nelson Oct. 7, 1936 Jun. 1, 1939<br />
1st Lt. Avelin P. Tacon Jr. Jun. 1, 1939 Unknown<br />
Maj. Paul Lobingier c. October 1942 Jan. 12, 1943<br />
Maj. David R. McGovern Jan. 12, 1943 Dec. 29, 1943<br />
Maj. Frank C. Clark Dec. 29, 43 Mar. 8, 1944<br />
Maj. Donald H. McAuley Mar. 8, 1944 Apr. 24, 1944<br />
Lt. Col. Cy Wilson Apr. 24, 1944 Jun. 25, 1944<br />
Maj. Martin L. Low Jun. 25, 1944 Dec. 6, 1944<br />
Capt. Richard Gatterdam Dec. 6, 1944 Mar. 23, 1945<br />
Maj. Jack C. Price Mar. 23, 1945 Apr. 4, 1945<br />
Maj. Maurice C. Cristadoro Jr. Apr. 4, 1995 Jul. 22, 1945<br />
Maj. Robert H. Riemensnider Jul. 22, 1945 Oct. 18, 1945<br />
Lt. Col. Franklin A. Nichols Jul. 29, 1946 Sep. 5, 1946<br />
Maj. John M. Winkler Sep. 5, 1946 Oct. 30, 1946<br />
Lt. Col. Alfred J. Ball Oct. 30, 1946 Jan. 8, 1947<br />
Lt. Col. Richard Cline Jan. 8, 1947 Apr. 30, 1947<br />
Lt. Col. Francis S. Gabreski Apr. 30, 1947 Aug. 4, 1947<br />
Maj. James C. Hare Aug. 4, 1947 Sep. 2, 1947<br />
Lt. Col. Melvin J. Nelson Sep. 2, 1947 May 5, 1948<br />
Maj. Harold A. Lind May 5, 1948 Jun. 21, 1948<br />
Lt. Col. Elmer E. McTaggart Jun. 21, 1948 c. October 1948<br />
Maj. Charles W. Lasko c. October 1948 c. April 1949<br />
Lt. Col. Gilbert O. Waymond Jr. c. April 1949 May 12, 1949<br />
Maj. Charles W. Lasko 12 May 1949 c. November 1949<br />
Lt. Col. William A. Mitchell Jr. c. November 1949 Jul. 24, 1951<br />
Maj. Joseph A. Hageman Jul. 24, 1951 Aug. 6, 1954<br />
Maj. John S. Bradley Aug. 6, 1954 Mar. 10, 1955<br />
Maj. John J. Kropenick Mar. 10, 1955 May 1, 1956<br />
Maj. Max T. Beall May 1, 1956 Jun. 15, 1956<br />
Lt. Col. Michael C. McCarthy Jun. 15, 1956 Mar. 15, 1957<br />
Lt. Col. Charles L. Miller Mar. 15, 1957 Nov. 2, 1957<br />
Lt. Col. Raymond L. Flint Nov. 2, 1957 Jan. 1, 1959<br />
Lt. Col. Raymond R. Stewart Jan. 1, 1959 Jun. 22, 1961<br />
Maj. Tony M. Greget Jun. 22, 1961 Jun. 30, 1963<br />
Maj. Walter P. Paluch Jr. Jun. 30, 1963 Jul. 22, 1964<br />
<strong>20th</strong> Fighter Wing History --- Page Number 46.