Financial Statements to 31 July 2008 - Perth College - UHI ...
Financial Statements to 31 July 2008 - Perth College - UHI ...
Financial Statements to 31 July 2008 - Perth College - UHI ...
Create successful ePaper yourself
Turn your PDF publications into a flip-book with our unique Google optimized e-Paper software.
<strong>Perth</strong> <strong>College</strong><br />
Statement of Corporate Governance and Internal Control<br />
The <strong>College</strong> is committed <strong>to</strong> exhibiting best practice in all aspects of corporate<br />
governance. This summary describes the manner in which the <strong>College</strong> has applied the<br />
principles set out in section 1 of the Combined Code of Corporate Governance issued by<br />
the London S<strong>to</strong>ck Exchange in June 2003 and updated in June 2006. Its purpose is <strong>to</strong> help<br />
the reader of the financial statements understand how the principles have been applied.<br />
In the opinion of the Board of Management, the <strong>College</strong> complies with all the provisions of<br />
the Combined Code in so far as they apply <strong>to</strong> the Further and Higher Education sec<strong>to</strong>r, and<br />
it has complied throughout the year ended <strong>31</strong> <strong>July</strong> <strong>2008</strong>.<br />
The Board of Management Members<br />
The members who served on the Board of Management and the changes <strong>to</strong> it during the<br />
year and up <strong>to</strong> the date of signing the accounts were as follows:<br />
Jim<br />
Adamson<br />
Margaret<br />
An<strong>to</strong>nson<br />
Penny<br />
Brodie<br />
Jenny<br />
Brookes<br />
James<br />
Calderhead<br />
Bill Duncan<br />
Mandy Exley<br />
Donald<br />
Jarvie<br />
Managing<br />
Direc<strong>to</strong>r,<br />
Speakeasy<br />
Productions<br />
Ltd<br />
Direc<strong>to</strong>r of<br />
LEAD<br />
Scotland<br />
Marketing<br />
Consultant<br />
Vice<br />
Principal,<br />
University of<br />
Dundee<br />
Retired<br />
banker<br />
Business<br />
Consultant<br />
Date of<br />
Appointment<br />
Date of<br />
Resignation<br />
Status of<br />
Appointment<br />
22 June 2004 Independent<br />
member<br />
1 April 2005 18 March<br />
<strong>2008</strong><br />
Support staff<br />
member<br />
21 Sept 2004 Independent<br />
member<br />
26 Sept 2007 Independent<br />
member<br />
21 Sept 2004 Independent<br />
member<br />
27 Sept 2006 Independent<br />
member<br />
Principal<br />
1 April 2003 Independent<br />
member<br />
Chris Mutch 1 Sept 2007 <strong>31</strong> Aug<br />
<strong>2008</strong><br />
Student<br />
member<br />
Ian Marr Chief<br />
Executive,<br />
YMCA <strong>Perth</strong><br />
27 Sept 2006 Independent<br />
member<br />
Ian Mathers Business 27 Sept 2006 Independent<br />
Alastair<br />
Napier<br />
Consultant<br />
Partner,<br />
Commercial<br />
Legal Centre<br />
member<br />
21 Sept 2005 Independent<br />
member<br />
Committees Served<br />
Academic Board<br />
Chair: Board<br />
Nominations;<br />
Remuneration<br />
Finance and<br />
General Purposes<br />
Chair: Finance and<br />
General Purposes;<br />
Nominations;<br />
Remuneration<br />
Finance and<br />
General Purposes<br />
Vice-Chair: Board<br />
Chair: Audit<br />
Chair: Nominations;<br />
Chair:<br />
Remuneration<br />
Finance and<br />
General Purposes<br />
Audit<br />
Academic Board<br />
Finance and<br />
General Purposes<br />
11