bentley priory - Spink
bentley priory - Spink
bentley priory - Spink
You also want an ePaper? Increase the reach of your titles
YUMPU automatically turns print PDFs into web optimized ePapers that Google loves.
September 6, 2012 - LONDON<br />
Air Vice-Marshal A. Gray<br />
C.B. London Gazette 8.6.1944 Air Commodore Alexander<br />
Gray, M.C., Royal Air Force.<br />
M.C. London Gazette 27.10.1917 2nd Lt. (T./Capt.)<br />
Alexander Gray, Arg. & Suth’d Highrs., and R.F.C.<br />
‘For conspicuous gallantry and devotion to duty. He took<br />
part in many successful operations over the enemy’s lines, in<br />
over twenty of which he acted as leader. On one occasion,<br />
when leading a bombing raid, his formation was heavily<br />
attacked by enemy aeroplanes. He shot one of them down,<br />
and brought back the whole of his formation safely. He also<br />
led a successful raid on an enemy aerodrome, and on several<br />
occasions obtained valuable photographs. He has accounted<br />
for two enemy aeroplanes with his front gun, and always<br />
showed great coolness, ability, and resource.’<br />
Air Vice-Marshal Alexander Gray, C.B., M.C., born<br />
Coatbridge, Lanarkshire, September 1896, and educated at<br />
Glasgow Technical College; on the outbreak of the Great<br />
War he declined a Commission and enlisted as a Private in the<br />
Highland Light Infantry, as ‘that was my best chance of<br />
seeing some quick fighting.’ Commissioned Second<br />
Lieutenant, Argyll and Sutherland Highlanders, he<br />
transferred to the Royal Flying Corps in early 1916, serving<br />
with No.55 Reconnaissance Squadron. Twice wounded, by a<br />
shell splinter to the right hand, 14.1.1917, and by a gun shot<br />
wound to the right hand, 1.3.1917, in December 1917,<br />
having been awarded the M.C., Gray was appointed Flight<br />
Commander of the Squadron.<br />
In October 1922 Gray married Mrs. Leonora Mary Baxter,<br />
the widow of Second Lieutenant E.F. Baxter, V.C., with<br />
whom he had two daughters. The following year he was<br />
posted to No.12 Squadron, based at RAF Northolt, before<br />
moving to Malta in November 1928, where much of his<br />
flying for the next year was testing aircraft for the Fleet Air<br />
Arm at Hal Far and the seaplane base. At the start of the<br />
Second World War he was promoted Group Captain and<br />
appointed to the Station Command of RAF Manston, a<br />
front-line airfield in the Battle of Britain. Subsequently, as Air<br />
Commodore, he was posted to India in 1942, where he also<br />
visited the forward areas of Burma. After the War he was<br />
appointed, in April 1947, Air-Officer Commanding Air<br />
Headquarters at Habbaninyah, Iraq, with the rank of Air<br />
Vice-Marshal. He retired from the Royal Air Force in 1949,<br />
and died 16.5.1980.<br />
109