68 Leadership and accountability The <strong>Oerlikon</strong> Executive Committee 1 Jürg Fedier 1955, Swiss citizen Chief Financial Officer (CFO) 1 Professional background and education Jürg Fedier was appointed Chief Financial Officer effective January 1, 2009. From 2007 to 2008 he acted as CFO of Ciba, Switzerland. Between 2006 and 2007, he was Head of Finance of Dow Europe and a Member of the Executive Board. From 2002 to 2006, Jürg Fedier served as Vice President Finance for Dow Chemical, Performance Chemicals, USA, between 2000 and 2002 as Global Business Finance Director for Dow Chemical, Thermosets. From 1978 to 2000, he filled several management positions with Dow Chemical in the USA and in Asia. Jürg Fedier holds a Commercial Diploma from the College of Commerce in Zurich, Switzerland, and completed international executive management programs at the IMD, Switzerland, and the University of Michigan, USA. Other activities and functions none 2 Dr. Michael Buscher 1965, German citizen Chief Executive Officer (CEO) 1 Professional background and education Dr. Michael Buscher was appointed Chief Executive Officer effective May 19, 2010. From 2007 to 2010, Dr. Michael Buscher acted as President of Bombardier’s Business Unit Propulsion & Controls, Switzerland. From 2003 to 2007, Dr. Michael Buscher served as Vice President of the Business Unit Locomotives, responsible for global Engineering, and from 2004 until 2007, he additionally served as Site Coordinator Zurich and Member of the Management Team of Bombardier Switzerland. Between 2000 and 2003, he acted as Engineering Head of Mannheim and Hennigsdorf (Director) at DaimlerChrysler Rail System GmbH (now Bombardier Transportation), Germany. Between 1990 and 2000, he held several positions with predecessor companies of Bombardier Transpor- tation. Dr. Michael Buscher graduated from the Technical University Darmstadt, Germany, with a PhD and a master’s degree in electrical engineering. Other activities and vested interests Dr. Michael Buscher is Deputy Chairman of the Advisory Board of PCS Power Converter Solutions GmbH. 3 Adrian Cojocaru 1964, Romanian citizen Chief Human Resources Officer (CHRO) 1 Professional background and education Adrian Cojocaru was appointed Chief Human Resources Officer effective November 10, 2010. From 2009 to 2010, he served as Regional Chief Human Resources Officer Middle East & Africa of LG Electronics in Dubai, United Arab Emirates. From 2008 to 2009, he worked as Human Resources Vice President Europe at Reader’s Digest in UK. Between 2001 and 2008, Adrian Cojocaru filled various HR management positions at Mars Inc., based in Central Europe and UK, from 1992 to 2001, several management positions with Unilever and Coca-Cola in Central & Eastern Europe, the Netherlands and in the USA. Adrian Cojocaru holds a Mechanical Engineer Diploma from the Polytechnic University in Bucharest, Romania and completed post-graduate studies in organizational change at Ashridge Business School, UK. Other activities and vested interests none Thomas Babacan 2 1969; German citizen Chief Operating Officer (COO) Professional background and education Thomas Babacan was appointed Chief Operating Officer effective October 1, 2008 and held this position until his resignation on December 31, <strong>2011</strong>. From 2009 to <strong>2011</strong>, he additionally held the position of CEO <strong>Oerlikon</strong> Textile. Between 2005 and 2008, he acted as CEO of <strong>Oerlikon</strong> Vacuum, Germany, and in 2005, he acted as CFO of <strong>Oerlikon</strong> Vacuum, Germany. From 2002 until 2005, he served as Regional Executive Europe and member of the Extended Executive Board of Unaxis Group (now <strong>Oerlikon</strong> Group). Between 2000 and 2002, he served as Deputy Group Treasurer of Unaxis Management AG (now OC <strong>Oerlikon</strong> Management AG, Pfäffikon), Switzerland, and was also responsible for special corporate finance (M&A) projects and for setting up the Greater China project. From 1999 until 2000, he held a position with Balzers & Leybold Deutschland Holding GmbH (now <strong>Oerlikon</strong> Deutschland Holding GmbH). Thomas Babacan holds a degree in economics from the Johann Wolfgang Goethe University, Frankfurt, Germany. Other activities and vested interests none 1 A description of the role and authority of each member of the Executive Committee can be found in the company’s Organizational and Governance Rules published on the <strong>Oerlikon</strong> website: www.oerlikon.com/corporate_governance/org. 2 Thomas Babacan left the Group on December 31, <strong>2011</strong>. Letter Information for Investors Operational Review Sustainability Compliance Corporate Governance 2
1 Remuneration <strong>Report</strong> Risk Management Financial <strong>Report</strong> Global Markets R & D Global Presence 2 3 4 5 3 69
- Page 1 and 2:
on a new level Annual Report 2011
- Page 3 and 4:
Vision Oerlikon creates innovative
- Page 5 and 6:
Oerlikon’s Segments in brief Text
- Page 7 and 8:
On a new level 2011 was a year of s
- Page 9 and 10:
I. Operational review We achieved a
- Page 11 and 12:
Dear Shareholders, 2011 was a break
- Page 13 and 14:
Solid performance of Oerlikon share
- Page 15 and 16:
Remuneration Report Risk Management
- Page 17 and 18:
Remuneration Report Risk Management
- Page 19 and 20:
Achieving a new level of profitabil
- Page 21 and 22:
Remuneration Report Risk Management
- Page 23:
Remuneration Report Risk Management
- Page 26 and 27:
Dr. Michael Buscher, CEO Oerlikon G
- Page 28 and 29:
3.1 Oerlikon Textile 1. In 2011, Oe
- Page 31 and 32:
Turnaround time reduced by 40 % The
- Page 33 and 34:
Turnaround time reduced by 40 %
- Page 35: Business development Oerlikon Drive
- Page 38 and 39: Gary Lehman, CEO Oerlikon Drive Sys
- Page 40 and 41: 3.3 Oerlikon Vacuum 1. Oerlikon Vac
- Page 43 and 44: Output improved by 30 % “For a lo
- Page 45 and 46: Output improved by 30 %
- Page 47: Business development In 2011, the s
- Page 50 and 51: Helmut Frankenberger, CEO Oerlikon
- Page 52 and 53: 3.5 Oerlikon Coating 1. Oerlikon Co
- Page 55 and 56: Productivity gains boost profitabil
- Page 57 and 58: Productivity gains boost profitabil
- Page 59: Business development Oerlikon Advan
- Page 62 and 63: Andreas Dill, CEO Oerlikon Advanced
- Page 64 and 65: 4.0 Sustainability 1. Oerlikon prod
- Page 66 and 67: 48 When a fine spray of fuel is fir
- Page 68 and 69: 5.0 Compliance 1. In 2011, Oerlikon
- Page 70 and 71: 6.0 Corporate Governance Group stru
- Page 72 and 73: 54 Letter Information for Investors
- Page 74 and 75: 56 Letter Information for Investors
- Page 76 and 77: 58 Stability and competence The Oer
- Page 78 and 79: 60 Composition of the Board of Dire
- Page 80 and 81: 62 Composition of Committees of the
- Page 82 and 83: 64 Letter Information for Investors
- Page 84 and 85: 66 Letter Information for Investors
- Page 88 and 89: 70 Composition of the Executive Com
- Page 90 and 91: 72 Letter Information for Investors
- Page 92 and 93: 74 Letter Information for Investors
- Page 94 and 95: 7.0 Remuneration report In this rem
- Page 96 and 97: 78 Compensation of non-executive me
- Page 98 and 99: 80 Letter Information for Investors
- Page 100 and 101: 82 Share options Letter Information
- Page 102 and 103: 8.0 Risk management 1. The 2011 enh
- Page 104 and 105: Contents I. Operational review 1.0
- Page 107 and 108: Key Figures Group Notes OC Oerlikon
- Page 109 and 110: Key Figures Group Notes OC Oerlikon
- Page 111 and 112: Key Figures Group Notes OC Oerlikon
- Page 113 and 114: Key Figures Group Notes OC Oerlikon
- Page 115 and 116: Key Figures Group Notes OC Oerlikon
- Page 117: Key Figures Group Notes OC Oerlikon
- Page 120 and 121: 102 Expenses included in EBIT Key F
- Page 122 and 123: 104 Deferred taxes Key Figures Grou
- Page 124 and 125: 106 Financial investments Key Figur
- Page 126 and 127: 108 Property, plant and equipment i
- Page 128 and 129: 110 Key Figures Group Notes OC Oerl
- Page 130 and 131: 112 Intangible assets Previous year
- Page 132 and 133: 114 Post-employment benefit provisi
- Page 134 and 135: 116 Provisions in CHF million Key F
- Page 136 and 137:
118 Liquidity risk Key Figures Grou
- Page 138 and 139:
120 Credit risk Key Figures Group N
- Page 140 and 141:
122 Market risk Key Figures Group N
- Page 142 and 143:
124 Capital management Key Figures
- Page 144 and 145:
126 Related Party transactions Key
- Page 146 and 147:
128 Related Party transactions Memb
- Page 148 and 149:
130 Segment information Key Figures
- Page 150 and 151:
132 Companies by country Country Pr
- Page 152 and 153:
134 Report of the Statutory Auditor
- Page 155 and 156:
Key Figures Group Notes OC Oerlikon
- Page 157 and 158:
Key Figures Group Notes OC Oerlikon
- Page 159 and 160:
Key Figures Group Notes OC Oerlikon
- Page 161 and 162:
Key Figures Group Notes OC Oerlikon
- Page 163 and 164:
Key Figures Group Notes OC Oerlikon
- Page 166 and 167:
Contents I. Operational review 1.0
- Page 168 and 169:
9.0 Outlook for global markets Tren
- Page 171:
Remuneration Report Risk Management
- Page 175:
Remuneration Report Risk Management
- Page 179:
Remuneration Report Risk Management
- Page 182 and 183:
10.0 Research and development In 20
- Page 184 and 185:
166 Innovation highlights Oerlikon
- Page 186 and 187:
168 Oerlikon Vacuum MAGiNTEGRA: rob
- Page 188 and 189:
170 Oerlikon Coating INGENIA: the q
- Page 190 and 191:
11.0 Expanding the global footprint
- Page 192 and 193:
174 Oerlikon further expands in gro
- Page 194 and 195:
176 the greater the opportunity for
- Page 197 and 198:
Financial calendar March 5, 2012 An
- Page 199:
AB Applied Biosystems ∙ ABB ∙ A