palfinger at a glance
palfinger at a glance
palfinger at a glance
Create successful ePaper yourself
Turn your PDF publications into a flip-book with our unique Google optimized e-Paper software.
search Print<br />
Governing Bodies<br />
Corpor<strong>at</strong>e Governance Report<br />
Management Board<br />
The Management Board of PALFINGER AG is composed of four members; Herbert Ortner has been<br />
the CEO since June 2008.<br />
Name First appointment End of term<br />
Herbert Ortner (CEO) 1 February 2003 31 December 2015<br />
Christoph Kaml (CFO) 1 January 2009 31 December 2015<br />
Wolfgang Pilz (CMO) 1 February 2003 31 December 2015<br />
Martin Zehnder (COO) 1 January 2008 31 December 2015<br />
Herbert Ortner<br />
CEO – Chief Executive Officer<br />
Born in 1968, Herbert Ortner was global Business Unit Manager for industrial hoses <strong>at</strong> the publicly<br />
listed Semperit Group until 2001. He then joined PALFINGER, where he developed the spare parts,<br />
equipment and service business before being appointed to the Management Board in February 2003.<br />
The focus of his activities as Chief Marketing Officer included PALFINGER’s railway applic<strong>at</strong>ions, tail<br />
lifts, transportable forklifts and access pl<strong>at</strong>forms as well as the further expansion of the service<br />
business. As CEO he has been in charge of legal affairs, procurement, personnel, sustainability,<br />
communic<strong>at</strong>ions and investor rel<strong>at</strong>ions since June 2008.<br />
Christoph Kaml<br />
CFO – Chief Financial Officer<br />
Born in 1974, Christoph Kaml started his career with Gemini Consulting. Before joining<br />
PALFINGER AG in 2004, he was a holder of a general commercial power of <strong>at</strong>torney <strong>at</strong> an M&A<br />
consulting company in Switzerland. In 2006, he switched from PALFINGER Corpor<strong>at</strong>e Development<br />
to the management of the area North America domiciled in Niagara Falls, Canada, where he was<br />
in charge of finances, str<strong>at</strong>egy and business development. Since January 2009, Kaml has been<br />
PALFINGER AG’s Chief Financial Officer.<br />
Wolfgang Pilz<br />
CMO – Chief Marketing Officer<br />
Born in 1959, Wolfgang Pilz has been working <strong>at</strong> PALFINGER in the crane business since 1984.<br />
He was appointed Marketing & Sales Manager of the truck crane division in 1997. Since<br />
February 2003, he has been Chief Marketing Officer and thus responsible for the marketing<br />
and sale of PALFINGER products.<br />
Martin Zehnder<br />
COO – Chief Oper<strong>at</strong>ing Officer<br />
Born in 1967, Martin Zehnder started his career <strong>at</strong> Alstom Schienenfahrzeuge AG in 1984. From<br />
2000 to 2005 he was Managing Director of Development and Production for Keystone Europe in<br />
France. In 2005 Martin Zehnder became Global Manufacturing Manager in charge of all manufacturing<br />
facilities of the PALFINGER Group, and since January 2008 he has been the Company’s Chief<br />
Oper<strong>at</strong>ing Officer, responsible for global manufacturing and assembly.<br />
<strong>palfinger</strong> Annual Report 2011<br />
33