Historical souvenir of Greenville, Illinois : being a ... - University Library
Historical souvenir of Greenville, Illinois : being a ... - University Library
Historical souvenir of Greenville, Illinois : being a ... - University Library
Create successful ePaper yourself
Turn your PDF publications into a flip-book with our unique Google optimized e-Paper software.
CHAKLKS \. WeISE,<br />
Member <strong>of</strong> the Weise and Bradford<br />
Corporation and manager <strong>of</strong> the<br />
Tuscola, 111., branch.<br />
death <strong>of</strong> W. V. Weise, senior member<br />
and founder <strong>of</strong> the business.<br />
No change occurred in the business<br />
until the summer <strong>of</strong> 19 02 when<br />
Chas. V. Weise opened the fifth Star<br />
store in Tuscola, III., Geo. V. Weise<br />
assuming full control <strong>of</strong> the Green-<br />
ville store. This arrangement still<br />
exists.<br />
It has always been the policy <strong>of</strong><br />
this firm to advance capable employees<br />
and three branches <strong>of</strong> the<br />
original firm are now managed by<br />
men who were formerly salesmen.<br />
They are Joe Murdock, <strong>of</strong> Bradford<br />
and Murdock, Virden, 111.: W. C.<br />
White <strong>of</strong> Bradford & White, Vandalia.<br />
III. and E. V. Buchanan <strong>of</strong><br />
Bradford & Buchanan, Sumner, 111.<br />
The <strong>Greenville</strong> store which is more<br />
closely related to this history has<br />
increased its outlet very materially<br />
during the last few years and is<br />
recognized everywhere as one <strong>of</strong><br />
the most complete stores <strong>of</strong> its kind<br />
in Southern <strong>Illinois</strong>. The <strong>of</strong>ficers <strong>of</strong><br />
the concern are Geo. D. Braford,<br />
President: Chas. V. Weise, Vice<br />
President and Geo. V. W^eise, Secretary<br />
and Treasurer.<br />
February 15, 1871. William S.<br />
Smith was treasurer from January<br />
18, 1867, to April 14, 1869. He<br />
was succeeded by Williamson Plant,<br />
who was treasurer until February<br />
15, 1871. Mr. Plant was also secretary<br />
for many years. C. D. Holies<br />
was assistant secretary for several<br />
years and his son, Guy B. Holies,<br />
was assistant secretary at the time<br />
<strong>of</strong> the merger <strong>of</strong> all the lines in December,<br />
1904.<br />
S. B. Hynes, a son <strong>of</strong> Rev. Thomas<br />
W. Hynes, was the first station agent<br />
and was afterwards one <strong>of</strong> the most<br />
prominent railroad men <strong>of</strong> the west.<br />
<strong>Historical</strong> Souvenir <strong>of</strong> <strong>Greenville</strong>, '<strong>Illinois</strong>. 87<br />
W.\RD Reid,<br />
Ex-City Clerk; Circuit Clerk from 1892 to 1904;<br />
Secretary Building and Savings .\ssociation;<br />
now in the real estate, loan, abstract and insurance<br />
business.<br />
holding high and responsible positions<br />
with some <strong>of</strong> the greatest railroads<br />
in the country. He was followed<br />
as station agent by J. E. Hunt.<br />
M. W. Van Valkenberg was the<br />
third station agent serving until<br />
1876, when he was succeeded by W.<br />
S. Ogden, who held the place for<br />
twenty years and died in 1896, in<br />
<strong>of</strong>fice. John Geismann was the next<br />
agent, serving until August 1, 1903,<br />
when he was succeeded by Edgar E.<br />
Elliott, who holds the position at<br />
the present time. Mr. Elliott was<br />
born August 6, 1866, entered the<br />
service <strong>of</strong> the railroad March 12,<br />
1888, as clerk; was promoted in<br />
April, 1893, to the position <strong>of</strong> cash-<br />
ier at the Brazil, Ind., freight sta-<br />
tion; in October, 1898, to the position<br />
<strong>of</strong> Agent at Greenup and on<br />
August 1. 1903, to the position <strong>of</strong><br />
Reside.sce <strong>of</strong> W.\rd Reid, East College .\ venue.