Australia Post Annual Report 2008–09
Australia Post Annual Report 2008–09
Australia Post Annual Report 2008–09
Create successful ePaper yourself
Turn your PDF publications into a flip-book with our unique Google optimized e-Paper software.
Notes to and forming part of the Financial <strong>Report</strong> for the year ended 30 June 2009<br />
26 Segment information (continued)<br />
Use of fair value accounting<br />
As outlined in note 1 to these accounts, the group uses cost as the basis for valuing land and buildings for its statutory accounts. Were fair values<br />
applied to land and buildings, the total segment assets would be as follows.<br />
Letters & associated services<br />
Parcels & logistics<br />
Agency services & retail merchandise<br />
Other and unallocated<br />
94<br />
<strong>Australia</strong> <strong>Post</strong> <strong>Annual</strong> <strong>Report</strong> <strong>2008–09</strong> | Financial and statutory reports<br />
2009<br />
$m<br />
1,676.6<br />
1,130.6<br />
484.6<br />
1628.8<br />
2008<br />
$m<br />
1,858.1<br />
1,151.7<br />
552.2<br />
2,717.5<br />
Total 4920.6 6,279.5<br />
27 Key management personnel remuneration and retirement benefits<br />
(a) Details of key management personnel<br />
(i) Directors<br />
David Mortimer Chairman (non-executive)<br />
Mark Birrell Deputy Chairman (non-executive)<br />
Graeme John Managing Director<br />
Margaret Gibson Director (non-executive)<br />
Sandra McPhee Retired as Director (non-executive) 12 April 2009<br />
Thomas Phillips Retired as Director (non-executive) 22 November 2008<br />
Ian Warner Director (non-executive)<br />
Mark Darras Appointed as Director (non-executive) 31 October 2008<br />
William Mansfield Appointed as Director (non-executive) 31 October 2008<br />
(ii) Executives<br />
Alec Ceselli General Manager, <strong>Post</strong> Logistics – resigned from role 17 April 2009<br />
Mark Howard General Manager, Corporate Infrastructure Services Division<br />
James Marshall General Manager, Mail & Networks Division<br />
Rodney McDonald Group Manager, Human Resources<br />
Peter Meehan Chief Finance Officer<br />
Bill Mitchell General Manager, Commercial Division<br />
Terry Sinclair General Manager, Corporate Development – appointed 1 January 2008<br />
(b) Compensation policies for key management personnel<br />
The performance of the group depends on the quality of its directors and executives. To achieve its financial and operational objectives,<br />
the group must attract, motivate and retain highly skilled directors and executives. In accordance with best practice corporate governance,<br />
the structure of non-executive director and executive compensation is separate and distinct.<br />
Director Compensation<br />
The compensation of the corporation’s non-executive directors is determined independently by the Commonwealth Remuneration Tribunal.<br />
Refer to the executive compensation section below for details of the managing director’s compensation arrangements.<br />
Remuneration levels for <strong>Australia</strong> <strong>Post</strong>’s non-executive directors for <strong>2008–09</strong> were as follows:<br />
Chairman<br />
Deputy Chairman<br />
Directors<br />
Audit Committee Chairman<br />
Audit Committee Member<br />
Details of individual amounts received in <strong>2008–09</strong> by each non-executive director are provided in part (e) of this note.<br />
$<br />
153,600<br />
85,685<br />
76,810<br />
17,750<br />
8,875