Download - African Bank
Download - African Bank
Download - African Bank
Create successful ePaper yourself
Turn your PDF publications into a flip-book with our unique Google optimized e-Paper software.
Corporate governance continued<br />
Board and sub-committee membership<br />
1 October 2002 to 30 November 2003<br />
Name Classification Designation Boards ABIL board committees<br />
Mabogoane AS Independent non-executive Chairman ABIL and ABL ✓ ✓ ✓ ✓<br />
Kekane JJ Independent non-executive ✓ ✓ ✓ ✓<br />
Shongwe BJT Independent non-executive ✓ ✓ ✓ ✓<br />
Tembe DFG Independent non-executive Chairman Group Remuneration and<br />
(Mozambican) Transformation Committee ✓ ✓ ✓ ✓<br />
Levitt SA Non-executive ✓ ✓ ✓ ✓<br />
Tugendhaft A Non-executive ✓ ✓ ✓ ✓<br />
Steffens GZ (German) Independent non-executive Chairman Group Risk Committee ✓ ✓ ✓ ✓<br />
Naidoo R Independent non-executive Chairman Directors’ Affairs Committee ✓ ✓ ✓ ✓<br />
Steele BPF Independent non-executive ✓ ✓ ✓ ✓ ✓<br />
Gibbon DB Independent non-executive Chairman Group Audit Committee ✓ ✓ ✓ ✓<br />
Goba BD Independent non-executive ✓ ✓ ✓ ✓<br />
Kirkinis L* Executive CEO ABIL ✓ ✓ ✕ ✕ ✕<br />
Schachat G** Executive Deputy Chairman ABIL ✓ ✓ ✕ ✕<br />
Sokutu TM Executive MD: Retail Lending ✓ ✓ ✓<br />
Woollam DF Executive Financial Director ABIL ✓ ✓ ✓ ✓ ✕<br />
Herselman AG Executive MD: Collections ✓ ✓<br />
De Ridder JA Executive MD: Specialised Lending ✓ ✓ ✓ ✓<br />
Fourie A Executive MD: Innovation ✓ ✓<br />
Symmonds RJ Non-executive director<br />
resigned 19 May 2003 ✕ ✕ ✕<br />
Adams N Non-executive director<br />
resigned 18 March 2003 ✕ ✕ ✕<br />
Marais DP Resigned as executive director<br />
ABL on 18 February 2003 ✕<br />
Ramsingh V Resigned as executive director<br />
ABL on 3 February 2003 ✕<br />
Coetzer EE Resigned as executive director<br />
ABL on 18 February 2003 ✕<br />
Mendelowitz MP ✓<br />
Jawno JM ✓<br />
Georgiou JR*** ✕ ✕<br />
Rossi R Resigned as director<br />
on 18 February 2003 ✕<br />
Birrel AS Resigned as director of<br />
Stangen on 13 November 2002 ✕<br />
Kirk IM Chairman Stangen ✓<br />
Martin S Secretary ✓ ✓ ✓ ✓ ✓ ✓ ✓ ✓<br />
✓ Active membership<br />
✕ Resigned<br />
* Leon Kirkinis resigned as a director of Stangen on 6 March 2003 and Theta on 25 September 2003<br />
** Gordon Schachat resigned as a director of Stangen on 6 March 2003 and Theta on 25 September 2003<br />
*** Raymond Georgiou resigned as a director of Stangen on 14 November 2002 and Theta on 18 February 2003<br />
ABL = <strong>African</strong> <strong>Bank</strong> Limited<br />
<strong>African</strong> <strong>Bank</strong> Investments Limited 46<br />
ABIL<br />
ABL<br />
Theta<br />
Stangen<br />
Directors’ Affairs<br />
Group Audit<br />
Group Risk<br />
Group Remuneration<br />
and Transformation